Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generation - Consolidated Billing
Sponsored by
Delegate Clippinger
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a subscriber organization for a community solar energy generating system to participate in consolidated billing provided by the electric company serving the territory of the community solar energy generating system.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generation - Consolidated Billing
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/04/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {263520/1 Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generation - Consolidated Billing
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-36)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generation - Consolidated Billing
House 2/04/2022 2/04/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments {263520/1 Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generation - Consolidated Billing
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Third Reading Passed (101-36) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Referred Finance 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/30/2022 5:37 PM
Click to return on the top page