Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County – Speed and School Bus Monitoring Systems MC 03–22
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring Montgomery county to annually compile and make publicly available a report for the previous fiscal year on each school bus monitoring system operated by a local jurisdiction; requiring Montgomery County, in coordination with the Maryland Department of Transportation, to examine the data to determine the 10 school bus stop locations with the highest number of citations for passing a stopped school bus and implement operational alternatives for those stops; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {753520/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (117-15)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/21/2022
Legislative Date
4/21/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Montgomery County – Speed and School Bus Monitoring Systems MC 03–22
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Favorable with Amendments {753520/1 Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Montgomery County – Speed and School Bus Monitoring Systems MC 03–22
House 3/21/2022 3/15/2022 Third Reading Passed (117-15) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Second Reading Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 67AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/01/2022 Returned Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/21/2022 4/21/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Text - Chapter - Montgomery County – Speed and School Bus Monitoring Systems MC 03–22
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:27 AM
Click to return on the top page