Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Maryland Route 200 (Intercounty Connector) MC 22-22
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the placement and use of at least one speed monitoring system between each exit ramp on Maryland Route 200 (Intercounty Connector) in Montgomery County; and requiring the Maryland Transportation Authority and Montgomery County to enter into a memorandum of understanding requiring Montgomery County to implement and administer the speed monitoring systems placed and used under the Act.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Montgomery County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Maryland Route 200 (Intercounty Connector) MC 22-22
House 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:26 PM
Click to return on the top page