Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Laboratory Tests
Sponsored by
Delegate Cullison
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "practice pharmacy" to include the ordering and administering of certain laboratory tests; and requiring, on or before January 1, 2022, the State Board of Pharmacy to adopt regulations to authorize pharmacists to order and administer certain laboratory tests, without a written, oral, or electronically transmitted prescription from an authorized prescriber, that are used for certain purposes.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0706
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Laboratory Tests
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Laboratory Tests
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:15 PM
Click to return on the top page