Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Building Standards and Emissions Reductions – High Performance, State, and Local Government Buildings, State Operations, and Eligible Projects
Sponsored by
Delegates Stein and Barve
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "high performance building" to include certain schools and public safety buildings and require that the building meet certain building standards; requiring the Department of General Services to establish a maximum acceptable global warming potential for certain categories of eligible materials used in certain eligible projects; requiring a unit of State government to specify the eligible materials that will be used in an eligible project in the solicitation for an eligible project; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022, October 1, 2022, July 1, 2024
Contingency - on enactment of another bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Building Standards and Emissions Reductions – High Performance, State, and Local Government Buildings, State Operations, and Eligible Projects
House 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
(   3-602.1,   3-602.3, 4-901 through 4-905 )
Last Updated: 4/11/2022 10:59 AM
Click to return on the top page