Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Schools - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate Szeliga
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Department of Education, a county board of education, or a public institution of higher education to establish a statewide virtual school in the State; repealing certain provisions of law regarding the establishment and operation of virtual schools; requiring the State to distribute certain funds to virtual schools; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1170 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Schools - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Text - First - Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Schools - Alterations
House 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Age
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:26 PM
Click to return on the top page