Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Healthy Air Act
Sponsored by
Delegate Jalisi
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Committee on Air Quality to create, on or before January 1, 2023, an air quality sampling and monitoring protocol for the collection of air quality and public health data associated with certain large animal-feeding operations.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1642 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Community Healthy Air Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/04/2022
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Community Healthy Air Act
House 2/04/2022 2/04/2022 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/26/2022 11:30 AM
Click to return on the top page