Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
Sponsored by
Delegate Jalisi
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from stopping, standing, or parking a vehicle that is not a plug-in electric drive vehicle in a parking space that is designated in a certain manner for the use of plug-in electric drive vehicles; and requiring that a parking space that is for the use of plug-in electric drive vehicles be counted in a certain way for complying with certain laws intended to meet certain requirements under the Americans with Disabilities Act.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0480 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/04/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
House 2/04/2022 2/04/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:26 PM
Click to return on the top page