Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Power Plant Research Program – Review of Application for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity – Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate Brooks
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which the Public Service Commission must notify the Department of Natural Resources and the Department of the Environment about an application for a certificate of public convenience and necessity associated with power plant construction; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to complete an independent environmental and socioeconomic project assessment report within 6 months after the Commission determines the application to be complete; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0417
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {803196/1 Adopted
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Buckel) Adopted
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-40)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
4/01/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-12)
Proceedings
39AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/28/2021
Legislative Date
5/28/2021
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Power Plant Research Program – Review of Application for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity – Alterations
House 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 3/03/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/04/2021 2/28/2021 Favorable with Amendments {803196/1 Adopted 19 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2021 2/28/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Buckel) Adopted 19 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2021 3/01/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Power Plant Research Program – Review of Application for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity – Alterations
House 3/10/2021 3/02/2021 Third Reading Passed (99-40) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 4/01/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Favorable Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Second Reading Passed 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 3/12/2021 Third Reading Passed (34-12) 39AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Returned Passed 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/28/2021 5/28/2021 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 8/2/2021 12:10 PM
Click to return on the top page