Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Firearm Telematics - Study
Sponsored by
Delegate Queen
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Defining "firearm telematics" as an electronic sensor or equipment installed on a firearm for purposes of tracking the location of the firearm if it becomes lost or stolen; requiring the Handgun Roster Board under the Department of State Police to study and make recommendations about firearm telematics; requiring the Handgun Roster Board to take certain actions in conducting the study and making recommendations; and requiring the Handgun Roster Board to report its findings to the Governor and the General Assembly by July 1, 2022.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0035 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Firearm Telematics - Study
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Safety - Firearm Telematics - Study
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:00 PM
Click to return on the top page