Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Officers’ Retirement System – Membership
Sponsored by
Delegates Bridges and Wells
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the Correctional Officers' Retirement System to include certain individuals serving in certain positions in the Department of Juvenile Services; providing for the calculation of a certain benefit from the Correctional Officers' Retirement System for individuals serving in certain positions on or before June 30, 2022; requiring the State Retirement Agency, on or before January 1, 2023, to notify the individuals who are affected by the Act of their right to transfer certain service credit; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0231
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0622 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Officers’ Retirement System – Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {203922/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Correctional Officers’ Retirement System – Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (123-16)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {253821/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Motion Reconsider Favorable Report as Amended (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Committee Amendment {253821/1 Withdrawn
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/21/2022
Legislative Date
4/21/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Correctional Officers’ Retirement System – Membership
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Text - First - Correctional Officers’ Retirement System – Membership
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Favorable with Amendments {203922/1 Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Correctional Officers’ Retirement System – Membership
House 3/10/2022 3/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (123-16) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2022 3/01/2022 Referred Budget and Taxation 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 4/06/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Favorable with Amendments {253821/1 Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Motion Reconsider Favorable Report as Amended (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Committee Amendment {253821/1 Withdrawn 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable Adopted 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Second Reading Passed 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/31/2022 Returned Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/21/2022 4/21/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Text - Chapter - Correctional Officers’ Retirement System – Membership
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:25 PM
Click to return on the top page