Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Horse Riding - Helmet Requirement for Minors
Sponsored by
Delegates Lehman, Pena-Melnyk, Forbes, Fraser-Hidalgo, Healey, Hill, Kaiser, Love, Proctor, Ruth, Shetty, Terrasa, Toles, and Williams
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting an adult from allowing a minor to ride a horse on certain property unless the minor is wearing a helmet that meets certain standards.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Horse Riding - Helmet Requirement for Minors
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {903424/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Delegate Saab) Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {593620/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Horse Riding - Helmet Requirement for Minors
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-34)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Horse Riding - Helmet Requirement for Minors
House 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Favorable with Amendments {903424/1 Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Delegate Saab) Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Floor Amendment {593620/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Horse Riding - Helmet Requirement for Minors
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (100-34) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2022 3/02/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:24 PM
Click to return on the top page