Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Programs - Dental Providers and Dental Students - Reimbursement
Sponsored by
Delegate Krebs
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health, under the Maryland Medical Assistance Program, to reimburse a dental provider for services rendered by a student of dentistry who is engaged in an educational program at a school of dentistry that meets certain requirements and is providing services under the supervision of a licensed dentist.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0465
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Programs - Dental Providers and Dental Students - Reimbursement
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/17/2021 2/17/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:58 PM
Click to return on the top page