Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Psychiatric Inpatient Care - Admissions Restrictions (Psychiatric Hospital Admissions Equity Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Bagnall, Pendergrass, Pena-Melnyk, Belcastro, Bhandari, Carr, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kaiser, Kelly, Kerr, Landis, R. Lewis, Rosenberg, Saab, and K. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 691
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Maryland Department of Health from limiting or restricting admission of a Maryland Medical Assistance Program recipient for inpatient care at a special psychiatric hospital or an acute general care hospital with separately identified inpatient psychiatric service except under certain circumstances; and requiring the Department by July 1 each year, beginning in 2024, to report certain information and data to the Senate Finance Committee and the House Health and Government Operations Committee.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0659
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {783126/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 691
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Psychiatric Inpatient Care - Admissions Restrictions (Psychiatric Hospital Admissions Equity Act)
House 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments {783126/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Psychiatric Inpatient Care - Admissions Restrictions (Psychiatric Hospital Admissions Equity Act)
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Referred Finance 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Second Reading Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 67AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/01/2022 Returned Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 691
Text - Chapter - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Psychiatric Inpatient Care - Admissions Restrictions (Psychiatric Hospital Admissions Equity Act)
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:24 PM
Click to return on the top page