Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws – Licensing of Businesses and Occupations – Definition of Vehicle Salesman
Sponsored by
Delegates Stein, Foley, and Fraser-Hidalgo
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 573
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "vehicle salesman" as it relates to certain vehicle laws governing the licensing of businesses and occupations to include certain individuals who, for a commission or other compensation, negotiate with or induce other persons to enter into a financial security or warranty agreement on behalf of a dealer in connection with the sale of a vehicle.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {873325/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 573
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws – Licensing of Businesses and Occupations – Definition of Vehicle Salesman
House 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws – Licensing of Businesses and Occupations – Definition of Vehicle Salesman
House 3/10/2022 3/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2022 3/01/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable with Amendments {873325/1 Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Vehicle Laws – Licensing of Businesses and Occupations – Definition of Vehicle Salesman
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 573
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws – Licensing of Businesses and Occupations – Definition of Vehicle Salesman
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:23 PM
Click to return on the top page