Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Fine Arts - Curriculum Requirement, Study, and Report (Arts Equity in Education Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Guyton
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, beginning in the 2022-2023 school year, county boards of education to provide in public schools a certain instructional program in fine arts; requiring the State Department of Education to study and make recommendations on or before July 31, 2023, regarding compliance with a certain regulation relating to instructional programs in fine arts; requiring, for fiscal years 2024 through 2026, the Governor to include $25,000,000 in the annual budget to carry out the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Fine Arts - Curriculum Requirement, Study, and Report (Arts Equity in Education Act)
House 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Age
(   4-111.5 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:23 PM
Click to return on the top page