Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Study on Expansion of Interstate Telehealth
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilkins and Charles
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission, in consultation with certain State agencies and stakeholders, to study ways that interstate telehealth can be expanded to allow State residents to use telehealth to receive health services from out-of-state practitioners; and requiring the Commission to submit a report on its findings and recommendations to the Senate Finance Committee and the House Health and Government Operations Committee on or before December 1, 2023.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Health Care Commission - Study on Expansion of Interstate Telehealth
House 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/13/2022 7:02 PM
Click to return on the top page