Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Definitions
Sponsored by
Delegate Chisholm
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Defining the terms "service dog", "support dog", and "therapy horse" for the purposes of the law governing the Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program in the Department of Veterans Affairs; defining "service dog" as one that is individually trained to perform certain tasks for the benefit of individuals with certain disabilities; defining "support dog" as one that is individually trained to provide certain support services; and defining "therapy horse" to include one that is deemed appropriate for interactions with veterans.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0284
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Definitions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Definitions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {284438/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Definitions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Definitions
House 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2021 3/14/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Definitions
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 25AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments {284438/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Definitions
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 11:30 AM
Click to return on the top page