Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Standardized Behavioral Health Questionnaire for Students - Development and Implementation
Sponsored by
Delegates Guyton, Forbes, Jackson, Krimm, J. Lewis, Luedtke, Rose, Ruth, Saab, Shoemaker, Terrasa, and Valentino-Smith
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports to develop, in consultation with certain stakeholders, guidelines for developing a standardized behavioral health questionnaire to identify students with behavioral health services needs; requiring that the questionnaire be given to the parent or guardian of each student when the student enrolls for school and every year thereafter; and requiring each behavioral health services coordinator to develop and implement a certain standardized behavioral health questionnaire.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {383422/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-34)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public Schools - Standardized Behavioral Health Screenings for Students - Development and Implementation
House 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Favorable with Amendments {383422/1 Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Schools - Standardized Behavioral Health Questionnaire for Students - Development and Implementation
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (97-34) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Hearing 4/05 at 1:15 p.m.
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/7/2022 2:41 PM
Click to return on the top page