Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law – Maryland Credit Services Business Act – Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegate Crosby
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a credit services business, its employees, and independent contractors from attempting to remove or advising a consumer to remove certain information from the consumer's credit report, calling or sending certain communications to certain entities, and sending certain communications to a person without disclosing certain information; requiring a certain credit services business, its employees, and independent contractors to provide certain information to a certain credit reporting agency or data furnisher; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0255
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commercial Law – Maryland Credit Services Business Act – Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2021
Legislative Date
2/01/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Commercial Law – Maryland Credit Services Business Act – Revisions
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/01/2021 2/01/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:44 PM
Click to return on the top page