Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Higher Education Outreach and College Access Program - Funding
Sponsored by
Delegate Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill, beginning in fiscal year 2024, an appropriation of $7,000,000 for the Maryland Higher Education Outreach and College Access Program.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Higher Education Outreach and College Access Program - Funding
House 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 Hearing canceled
House 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:22 PM
Click to return on the top page