Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance – Title Insurance Producers – Annual Review
Sponsored by
Delegate Carey
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 700
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a title insurer to conduct a required annual review of a title insurance producer in person, remotely by using mail, overnight delivery, or electronic means, or by a combination of in-person and remote methods.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0293
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Insurance – Title Insurance Producers – Annual Review
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {993929/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Insurance – Title Insurance Producers – Annual Review
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 700
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Insurance – Title Insurance Producers – Annual Review
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Insurance – Title Insurance Producers – Annual Review
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2022 3/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Favorable with Amendments {993929/1 Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Insurance – Title Insurance Producers – Annual Review
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2022 3/02/2022 Referred Finance 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 Returned Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 700
Text - Chapter - Insurance – Title Insurance Producers – Annual Review
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:31 PM
Click to return on the top page