Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Performing Arts Nonprofit Organization License
Sponsored by
Harford County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1011
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing in Harford County a performing arts nonprofit organization beer, wine, and liquor license that authorizes the holder to sell or serve beer, wine, and liquor for on-premises consumption at up to three locations designated at the time of application; requiring the holder of the license to comply with certain record-keeping and reporting requirements; establishing an annual license fee of $750; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0734
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2024
Legislative Date
1/29/2024
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {243423/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/10/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
4/04/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {343720/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2024
Legislative Date
5/16/2024
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1011
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Performing Arts Nonprofit Organization License
House 1/29/2024 1/29/2024 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/16/2024 3/08/2024 Favorable with Amendments {243423/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/08/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Performing Arts Nonprofit Organization License
House 3/18/2024 3/10/2024 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/06/2024 Referred Finance 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 4/04/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/04/2024 3/20/2024 Favorable with Amendments {343720/1 Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/20/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/21/2024 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 House Concurs Senate Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Performing Arts Nonprofit Organization License
Post Passage 5/16/2024 5/16/2024 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1011
Text - Chapter - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Performing Arts Nonprofit Organization License
Last Updated: 6/11/2024 4:54 PM
Click to return on the top page