Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Center for History and Culture – Annual Appropriation
Sponsored by
Delegates McIntosh, Bridges, and Wells
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor, each fiscal year, to include a $1,000,000 appropriation in the annual budget bill to the Maryland Center for History and Culture to assist the Center in preserving its collection, maintaining a historical museum, and providing access to the public, including educational programs.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0915
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Center for History and Culture – Annual Appropriation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/16/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Center for History and Culture – Annual Appropriation
House 2/16/2022 2/16/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:22 PM
Click to return on the top page