Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Accountability and Implementation Board - Membership
Sponsored by
Delegates Ghrist, Anderton, Arentz, Arikan, Buckel, M. Fisher, Griffith, Hartman, Hornberger, Howard, Jacobs, Kipke, Krebs, McComas, Munoz, Reilly, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Szeliga, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the membership and qualifications of members of the Accountability and Implementation Board; and requiring the Accountability and Implementation Board Nominating Committee to submit a certain slate of nominees to the Governor on or before August 1, 2022.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0933
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Accountability and Implementation Board - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Accountability and Implementation Board - Membership
House 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:22 PM
Click to return on the top page