Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public High Schools - Financial Literacy Pilot Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Brooks, Acevero, Anderton, D. Barnes, C. Branch, T. Branch, Buckel, Carr, Charkoudian, W. Fisher, Forbes, Fraser-Hidalgo, Guyton, Harrison, Henson, Hill, Holmes, Howard, Jackson, Johnson, Kipke, Lehman, Lierman, Lisanti, Lopez, McComas, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Qi, Rogers, Ruth, Sample-Hughes, Shetty, Smith, Solomon, Szeliga, Valderrama, Walker, Washington, Watson, Wilkins, Williams, Wivell, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education to establish a Financial Literacy Pilot Program for public school students, including public charter school students, in Grades 11 and 12; requiring the curriculum content to include lessons on budgeting, saving money, debt, investments, amortization, interest and other issues as appropriate; authorizing each public school to implement the curriculum content beginning in the 2023-2024 school year; and requiring a report to the General Assembly on the status of the Program by January 1, 2027.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public High Schools - Financial Literacy Pilot Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public High Schools - Financial Literacy Pilot Program - Establishment
House 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Age
(   7-205.5 )
Last Updated: 2/19/2022 1:00 PM
Click to return on the top page