Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Registered Behavior Technicians – Reimbursement
Sponsored by
Delegate Kelly
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to provide reimbursement for applied behavior analysis services provided by registered behavior technicians under the Maryland Medical Assistance Program; and prohibiting, subject to a certain exception, the Department from requiring as a condition of reimbursement that an individual receive a certain certification to provide applied behavior analysis services as a registered behavior technician to Program recipients.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Registered Behavior Technicians – Reimbursement
House 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   15-114.2 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:22 PM
Click to return on the top page