Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George’s County – Alcoholic Beverages – Alcohol Density Zones and Licenses PG 307–21
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Prince George's County to approve the transfer of a Class A beer, wine, and liquor license into a part of certain alcoholic beverages districts in the county if the original licensed premises is in an alcohol density zone; and defining "alcohol density zone" as a census tract having an average of three or more licensed premises with a Class A beer, wine, and liquor license per square mile.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {573696/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-1)
Proceedings
32AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
4/06/2021
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Prince George’s County – Alcoholic Beverages – Alcohol Density Zones and Licenses PG 307–21
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2021 3/25/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/25/2021 3/12/2021 Favorable with Amendments {573696/1 Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2021 3/12/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Prince George’s County – Alcoholic Beverages – Alcohol Density Zones and Licenses PG 307–21
House 3/29/2021 3/13/2021 Third Reading Passed (128-1) 32AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Referred Rules 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2021 4/06/2021 Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/6/2021 9:10 PM
Click to return on the top page