Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Parental Rights Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Cox, Arikan, Parrott, Reilly, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that the State Board of Education and county boards of education allow a certain amount of time for certain testimony at public board meetings; prohibiting an employee of a school district from withholding certain information relating to a child's health or well-being from the child's parent or guardian; requiring each county board to establish and adopt a certain policy regarding the promotion of parent involvement in the public school system; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Parental Rights Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing canceled (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/16/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Ways and Means and Judiciary
Text - First - Maryland Parental Rights Act
House 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing canceled (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
House 2/16/2022 2/16/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
(   2-204,   3-104,   7-129, 7-130, 7-131 )
(   5-1501 through 5-1505 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:21 PM
Click to return on the top page