Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Appropriations for School Safety Expenditures - Increase
Sponsored by
Delegates Griffith, Anderton, Arikan, Buckel, Cox, Ghrist, Hartman, Hornberger, Howard, Jacobs, Kipke, Krebs, Mangione, McComas, McKay, Novotny, Otto, Pippy, Reilly, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing from $10,000,000 to $20,000,000 certain annual appropriations for certain school safety expenditures beginning in fiscal year 2024.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Reassigned to Appropriations
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public Schools - Appropriations for School Safety Expenditures - Increase
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Reassigned to Appropriations 9 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/9/2022 11:49 AM
Click to return on the top page