Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Board of Public Works - Historic Sotterley - Operating Grant
Sponsored by
Delegates Crosby, Clark, and Morgan
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 595
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor, for fiscal years 2024, 2025, and 2026, to include in the annual budget bill a certain appropriation for the Board of Public Works to provide an operating grant to the Board of Trustees of the Historic Sotterley, Inc., to be used for the design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, and general operations and expenses of Historic Sotterley, located in Hollywood.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0913
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Board of Public Works - Sotterley Plantation - Operating Grant
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {553024/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Board of Public Works - Sotterley Plantation - Operating Grant
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (110-28)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {493826/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (111-25)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Board of Public Works - Historic Sotterley- Operating Grant
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 595
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Board of Public Works - Historic Sotterley - Operating Grant
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Board of Public Works - Sotterley Plantation - Operating Grant
House 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments {553024/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Board of Public Works - Sotterley Plantation - Operating Grant
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (110-28) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Referred Budget and Taxation 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 4/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Favorable with Amendments {493826/1 Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (111-25) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Board of Public Works - Historic Sotterley- Operating Grant
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 595
Text - Chapter - Board of Public Works - Historic Sotterley - Operating Grant
Statutes
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:15 PM
Click to return on the top page