Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Community Investment Corporation - Establishment (Housing and Community Development Financing Act of 2024)
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Allen, Amprey, Anderton, Bagnall, Bhandari, Bouchat, Buckel, Charkoudian, Conaway, Crutchfield, Davis, Ebersole, Edelson, Fennell, Foley, Grossman, Guyton, Guzzone, Henson, Hill, Holmes, Hornberger, Jackson, A. Johnson, S. Johnson, D. Jones, Kaiser, Kaufman, J. Long, McCaskill, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Pasteur, Patterson, Phillips, Pruski, Qi, Roberts, Ruff, Ruth, Simmons, Simpson, Solomon, Spiegel, Taveras, Toles, Turner, Valderrama, Watson, White Holland, Williams, Boyce, Healey, Lehman, Stein, Terrasa
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Community Investment Corporation as an independent unit to make investments and financial assistance available in certain low-income communities in the State; expanding the eligible uses of the Strategic Demolition and Smart Growth Impact Fund to include grants and loans for credit enhancement for certain projects; requiring that members of the investment committee to be geographically representative of the locations of low-income communities in the State; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0483
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2024
Legislative Date
1/26/2024
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {643821/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (114-19)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
4/04/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-7)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
Text - First - Maryland Community Investment Corporation - Establishment (Housing and Community Development Financing Act of 2024)
House 1/26/2024 1/26/2024 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2024 3/13/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/13/2024 3/02/2024 Favorable with Amendments {643821/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2024 3/02/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Community Investment Corporation - Establishment (Housing and Community Development Financing Act of 2024)
House 3/15/2024 3/06/2024 Third Reading Passed (114-19) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment Budget and Taxation 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 4/04/2024 Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 4/04/2024 3/20/2024 Favorable Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/20/2024 Second Reading Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Third Reading Passed (32-7) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2024 3/26/2024 Returned Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
(   10-1101 through 10-1123, 9-101   )
Last Updated: 4/15/2024 2:39 PM
Click to return on the top page