Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Growing Apprenticeships and the Public Safety Workforce (GAPS) Act
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Allen, Alston, Amprey, Anderton, Bagnall, Bartlett, Bhandari, Boafo, Bouchat, Boyce, Conaway, Crutchfield, Davis, Edelson, Fennell, Foley, Forbes, Fraser-Hidalgo, Griffith, Grossman, Guyton, Harris, Henson, Hill, Hornberger, Jackson, A. Johnson, S. Johnson, D. Jones, Kaiser, Kaufman, Lopez, Love, McCaskill, Miller, Mireku-North, Munoz, Pasteur, Patterson, Phillips, Pruski, Qi, Roberson, Roberts, Ruff, Ruth, Simmons, Simpson, Solomon, Spiegel, Taveras, Taylor, Toles, Tomlinson, Turner, Watson, Williams, Wu, and Young
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the Law Enforcement Cadet Apprenticeship Program in the Maryland Department of Labor to be the Public Safety Apprenticeship Program; expanding the purpose and scope of the Program to promote careers with certain public safety agencies; altering the eligibility criteria and the types of grants to be awarded under the Program; requiring the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission to develop certain mental health wellness policies to be implemented in certain law enforcement agencies and correctional facilities; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0470
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
By Request of the Governor
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Growing Apprenticeships and the Public Safety Workforce (GAPS) Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {163324/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Growing Apprenticeships and the Public Safety Workforce (GAPS) Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/09/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
4/01/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Growing Apprenticeships and the Public Safety Workforce (GAPS) Act
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments {163324/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Growing Apprenticeships and the Public Safety Workforce (GAPS) Act
House 3/18/2024 3/09/2024 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Judicial Proceedings 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2024 4/01/2024 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2024 3/15/2024 Second Reading Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 2:25 PM
Click to return on the top page