Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of the Environment - Supplemental Environmental Projects Database
Sponsored by
Delegate Mangione
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to create and maintain a database of supplemental environmental projects that the Department may consider for implementation as part of a settlement of an enforcement action; and requiring the Department to prioritize the selection of a supplemental environmental project located in the same geographic area as the alleged violation and to ensure that the scope and cost of a chosen project are sufficient to allow the Department and the alleged violator to reach a settlement.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0090
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Department of the Environment - Supplemental Environmental Projects Database
House 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/08/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of the Environment - Supplemental Environmental Projects Database
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Referred Rules 72 Click to view Recorded Media
(   1-306 )
Last Updated: 5/4/2022 12:11 PM
Click to return on the top page