Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing an exception to motor vehicle registration requirements for personal delivery devices; authorizing a personal delivery device to operate on any roadway, sidewalk, shoulder, footpath, bicycle trail, or crosswalk in the State; prohibiting a personal delivery device from being operated in certain manners; creating certain marking, equipment, and insurance requirements for personal delivery devices being operated on roadways, sidewalks, shoulders, or crosswalks; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0726
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1483 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {380516/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable with Amendments {380516/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Referred Rules 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
(   11-135, 11-176, 13-402, 21-104.5 )
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 12:56 PM
Click to return on the top page