Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Action Agencies - Provision of Feminine Hygiene Products
Sponsored by
Delegates Bagnall, Bartlett, Boyce, Davis, Henson, D. Jones, Lehman, Ruth, Terrasa, Pendergrass, Pena-Melnyk, Belcastro, Bhandari, Carr, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, Landis, R. Lewis, Rosenberg, and K. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 725
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain community action agencies, in collaboration with appropriate local health departments, to make available to any women enrolled in the Maryland Medical Assistance Program feminine hygiene products in an amount sufficient to meet the needs of the woman obtaining the feminine hygiene products, subject to the availability of certain funding; and requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill funding in an amount estimated to be sufficient for providing feminine hygiene products as required by the Act.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0757 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {603221/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Community Action Agencies - Provision of Feminine Hygiene Products
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (106-32)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Referred Finance Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 725
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Community Action Agencies - Provision of Feminine Hygiene Products
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Local Health Departments and Community Action Agencies - Feminine Hygiene Products
House 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments {603221/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Community Action Agencies - Provision of Feminine Hygiene Products
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (106-32) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Referred Finance Budget and Taxation 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Second Reading Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 67AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/01/2022 Returned Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 725
Text - Chapter - Community Action Agencies - Provision of Feminine Hygiene Products
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:26 PM
Click to return on the top page