Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Queen Anne's County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsored by
Delegates Arentz, Ghrist, and Jacobs
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Adding Queen Anne's County to the list of counties that exempt agricultural buildings used for agritourism from certain building performance standards; and exempting a building used for agritourism in Queen Anne's County from a certain permit requirement under certain circumstances.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0489
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Queen Anne's County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/04/2022
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {533228/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Queen Anne's County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2022
Legislative Date
4/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Queen Anne's County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Queen Anne's County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
House 2/04/2022 2/04/2022 Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing canceled
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Favorable with Amendments {533228/1 Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Queen Anne's County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 66AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Returned Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/12/2022 4/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Text - Chapter - Queen Anne's County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:53 PM
Click to return on the top page