Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Use of Force Incident Reports
Sponsored by
Delegates Williams, Crutchfield, Lopez, Moon, Simpson, Woods, and Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the reporting requirement applicable to a law enforcement officer or police officer involved in a use of force incident in the line of duty to include the law enforcement officer's justification for the use of force; and requiring a local law enforcement agency to publish on its website by January 1, 2024 and every 3 months thereafter, certain information regarding the use of force incidents reported for the preceding 3 months.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2023
Legislative Date
2/03/2023
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Use of Force Incident Reports
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2023
Legislative Date
2/06/2023
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2023 2/03/2023 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Safety - Use of Force Incident Reports
House 2/06/2023 2/06/2023 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 6/9/2023 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page