Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges and Surviving Spouses - Pensions
Sponsored by
Delegate P. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 601
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring Baltimore County to pay Orphans' Court judges, if the judge was in office on or after January 1, 2022, and their surviving spouses a certain pension under certain circumstances; and requiring the County Council of Baltimore County to establish, by law, certain requirements and procedures relating to the pension of a judge of the Orphans' Court.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0432
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-1)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {903220/1 (Senator Sydnor) Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-2)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 601
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges and Surviving Spouses - Pensions
House 3/02/2022 3/02/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/17/2022 3/10/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges and Surviving Spouses - Pensions
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Third Reading Passed (128-1) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Floor Amendment {903220/1 (Senator Sydnor) Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (131-2) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges and Surviving Spouses - Pensions
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 601
Text - Chapter - Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges and Surviving Spouses - Pensions
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:21 PM
Click to return on the top page