Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Permits, Licenses, and Certificates - Processing (Transparent Government Act of 2024)
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Allen, Amprey, Anderton, Bagnall, Bhandari, Boafo, Bouchat, Boyce, Buckel, Conaway, Crutchfield, Davis, Ebersole, Edelson, Fennell, Foley, Forbes, Fraser-Hidalgo, Grossman, Guyton, Guzzone, Harris, Harrison, Henson, Hill, Hornberger, Jackson, A. Johnson, S. Johnson, Kaiser, Kaufman, J. Long, Lopez, Love, Munoz, Pasteur, Patterson, Phillips, Pruski, Qi, Roberson, Roberts, Rose, Ruff, Ruth, Simmons, Simpson, Solomon, Spiegel, Stewart, Taveras, Taylor, Toles, Tomlinson, Turner, Watson, Williams, Ziegler, Alston, Chisholm, Cullison, Kerr, Kipke, R. Lewis, Martinez, Pena-Melnyk, Rosenberg, White Holland, and Woods
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain departments and independent units to create a certain catalog of information relating to permits, licenses, and certificates issued by the department or independent unit and to submit the catalog to the Governor on or before October 1, 2024; requiring certain departments and independent units to post certain completed information relating to permits, licenses, and certificates on the website of the department or independent unit by October 1, 2025; establishing the Government Efficiency Commission; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0472
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2024
Legislative Date
1/26/2024
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {183629/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
4/03/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {793429/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Government - Permits, Licenses, and Certificates - Processing (Transparent Government Act of 2024)
House 1/26/2024 1/26/2024 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/05/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable with Amendments {183629/1 Adopted 36BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2024 2/26/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Government - Permits, Licenses, and Certificates - Processing (Transparent Government Act of 2024)
House 3/07/2024 2/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 4/03/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Favorable with Amendments {793429/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 House Concurs Senate Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Government - Permits, Licenses, and Certificates - Processing (Transparent Government Act of 2024)
(   8-506, 9-3801, 9-3802 )
Last Updated: 4/15/2024 2:38 PM
Click to return on the top page