Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County – Overdue Property Taxes – Waiver of Interest and Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegate Long
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the governing body of Baltimore County to waive any interest or penalties imposed on a person for late payment of the county property tax on residential real property in Baltimore County for tax years beginning after June 30, 2021, but ending before July 1, 2023; and terminating the Act on December 31, 2023.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2021
Legislative Date
1/21/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Baltimore County – Overdue Property Taxes – Waiver of Interest and Penalties
House 1/21/2021 1/21/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:41 PM
Click to return on the top page