Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law – Child Custody and Visitation – Disease or Illness
Sponsored by
Delegates Cox, Arikan, Boteler, Hornberger, McComas, McKay, Parrott, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a disease or an illness of a party that has not required hospitalization from being considered by a court as a factor for denying the party child custody or visitation in a custody or visitation proceeding.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law – Child Custody and Visitation – Disease or Illness
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Family Law – Child Custody and Visitation – Disease or Illness
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing canceled
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:20 PM
Click to return on the top page