Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Custody - Cases Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence - Training for Judges
Sponsored by
Delegate W. Fisher
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Judiciary, in consultation with domestic violence and child abuse organizations, to develop a training program for judges and magistrates presiding over child custody cases involving child abuse or domestic violence; requiring the training program to include certain information; and requiring the Maryland Judiciary to adopt procedures to ensure that only judges who have received certain training are assigned child custody cases that may involve child abuse or domestic violence.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0017
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1036 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022, July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {673523/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-3)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Child Custody - Cases Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence - Training for Judges
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable with Amendments {673523/1 Adopted 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Child Custody - Cases Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence - Training for Judges
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (130-3) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Referred Rules 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
(   9-101.3 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:20 PM
Click to return on the top page