Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Residency Requirement
Sponsored by
Carroll County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 597
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Requiring at least one applicant for an alcoholic beverages license in Carroll County to be a resident of the State, rather than the county, when an application is filed and to remain a resident of the State for the license to remain valid; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0393
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2023
Legislative Date
2/03/2023
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Residency Requirement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2023
Legislative Date
2/03/2023
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/17/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/10/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {973029/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/10/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Residency Requirement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/13/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/13/2023
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2023
Legislative Date
4/03/2023
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2023
Legislative Date
3/21/2023
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2023
Legislative Date
3/23/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2023
Legislative Date
3/25/2023
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2023
Legislative Date
5/08/2023
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 597
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2023 2/03/2023 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Residency Requirement
House 2/03/2023 2/03/2023 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2023 3/17/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2023 3/10/2023 Favorable with Amendments {973029/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2023 3/10/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Residency Requirement
House 3/20/2023 3/13/2023 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2023 3/13/2023 Referred Finance 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2023 4/03/2023 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/03/2023 3/21/2023 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2023 3/23/2023 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2023 3/25/2023 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2023 5/08/2023 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 597
Text - Chapter - Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Residency Requirement
Last Updated: 6/9/2023 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page