Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer College Investment Plan - State Contributions - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that a State contribution to a Maryland Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer College Investment Plan may be made to one account for each qualified beneficiary; limiting a qualified beneficiary from receiving more than one State contribution for each year the beneficiary is eligible for the State contribution; and authorizing the Maryland 529 Board to adopt certain regulations.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0615
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer College Investment Plan - State Contributions - Alterations
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   18-19A-01, 18-19A-02, 18-19A-04.1 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:54 PM
Click to return on the top page