Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License Annual Fee
Sponsored by
Harford County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reducing the annual fee for a stadium beer, wine, and liquor license in Harford County from $10,000 to $4,000.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0483
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License Annual Fee
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {353225/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License Annual Fee
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License Annual Fee
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Favorable with Amendments {353225/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License Annual Fee
House 3/17/2022 3/10/2022 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/22/2022 2:24 PM
Click to return on the top page