Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Buildings – Geothermal Energy Systems – Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegate Barve
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State to install a geothermal energy system in certain State buildings constructed by the State if the payback period for the system is less than or equal to 20 years.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Buildings – Geothermal Energy Systems – Requirement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2021
Legislative Date
1/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Buildings – Geothermal Energy Systems – Requirement
House 1/19/2021 1/19/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/30/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:39 PM
Click to return on the top page