Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Charles County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Sponsored by
Charles County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow a person in Charles County to hunt any game bird or game mammal during a certain time period on certain Sundays during the open season for that game bird or game mammal.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0388
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Charles County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Charles County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (118-18)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {923324/1 Adopted
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (119-6)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Charles County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Charles County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Charles County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
House 3/02/2022 3/02/2022 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Charles County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Third Reading Passed (118-18) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable with Amendments {923324/1 Adopted 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (119-6) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Charles County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424
Text - Chapter - Charles County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 2:56 PM
Click to return on the top page