Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Infant and Early Childhood Mental Health Support Services Program - Established
Sponsored by
Delegates Ebersole, Feldmark, Hill, Solomon, and Wilkins
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 494
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Infant and Early Childhood Mental Health Support Services Program to promote positive mental and behavioral health practices for young children by providing certain referrals and services for children, families, teachers, and caregivers; requiring the State Department of Education to administer the Program; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill in fiscal year 2024 and each fiscal year thereafter an appropriation of $3,000,000 for the operation of the Program; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {163225/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {933322/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-1)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 494
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Infant and Early Childhood Mental Health Consultation Program - Established
House 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments {163225/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Infant and Early Childhood Mental Health Support Services Program - Established
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable with Amendments {933322/1 Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (132-1) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Infant and Early Childhood Mental Health Support Services Program - Established
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 494
Text - Chapter - Infant and Early Childhood Mental Health Support Services Program - Established
Age
(   9.5-115 )
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:10 PM
Click to return on the top page