Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Coast Smart Siting and Design Criteria - Private Construction or Reconstruction Projects and Enforcement
Sponsored by
Delegate Lehman
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Applying Coast Smart siting and design criteria to certain private construction or reconstruction projects beginning on July 1, 2022; exempting certain private construction or reconstruction projects from the application of the Act; establishing that the Department of Natural Resources has sole responsibility for enforcement of the Act, subject to a certain delegation of enforcement authority; requiring the Secretary of Natural Resources to delegate certain enforcement authority to a certain county or municipality; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0528
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2021
Legislative Date
1/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Coast Smart Siting and Design Criteria - Private Construction or Reconstruction Projects and Enforcement
House 1/19/2021 1/19/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
(   3-1001, 3-1009 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:39 PM
Click to return on the top page